There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Botanical Sciences and Native Plant Materials Research, Restoration, and Promotion Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote botanical research and botanical sciences capacity, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
07/18/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
04/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 03/06/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/06/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 03/06/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 03/06/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/06/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/07/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 03/07/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 03/07/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 03/11/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/18/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/21/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/21/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 03/25/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/25/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/27/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/28/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/09/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/18/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 05/02/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 05/02/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/03/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 05/03/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/24/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/03/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/03/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 06/05/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/25/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 07/02/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/02/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/15/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/23/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 08/02/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 08/30/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 10/29/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 12/03/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 02/03/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 03/11/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/06/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands03/28/2019 Referred to
07/18/2019 Hearings by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife03/28/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture03/06/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry04/03/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1572. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/06/2019)

Botanical Sciences and Native Plant Materials Research, Restoration, and Promotion Act

This bill directs the Bureau of Land Management (BLM), the U.S. Geological Survey, the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, the National Park Service, and other appropriate entities to support a program of intramural and extramural botanical science research to support the land management responsibilities of the Department of the Interior. Interior may hire additional personnel to augment its expertise in the botanical sciences.

Interior's land management agencies and the Forest Service shall give preference to using locally adapted native plant materials when undertaking land management activities on lands under their respective jurisdictions.

Specified federal agencies shall collaborate regarding land use responsibility when undertaking specified activities, including the development of genetically appropriate seed, related to native plant materials.

The bill authorizes the BLM to undertake specified activities for the development and use of native plant materials, including the protection of rare plants on public lands.

The National Fish and Wildlife Foundation shall ensure that a program of activities which is focused on conservation and protection of native plants is incorporated into its existing programs and activities.