There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Closing the Law Enforcement Consent Loophole Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to make it a criminal offense for individuals to engage in sexual acts while acting under color of law or with individuals in their custody, to encourage States to adopt similar laws, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/06/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 03/06/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/06/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 03/06/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/04/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 06/04/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 06/04/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 06/04/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/04/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/04/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/11/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/11/2020
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/11/2020
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 06/11/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/22/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 06/22/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/22/2020
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/22/2020
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 06/22/2020
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/24/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/24/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 06/24/2020
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 06/24/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/24/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/24/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/24/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 06/26/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 06/29/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/16/2020
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 08/11/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 08/14/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary03/06/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security04/08/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1574. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/06/2019)

Closing the Law Enforcement Consent Loophole Act of 2019

This bill makes it unlawful for a federal law enforcement officer to engage in a sexual act while acting under color of law or with an individual who is under arrest, in detention, or in custody.

Consent is not a defense to prosecution for unlawful conduct. A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of up to 15 years, or both.

Additionally, the bill authorizes the Department of Justice to make grants to states that have in effect similar laws. Grants must be used for the same purposes as formula grants under the STOP Violence Against Women Program and the Sexual Assault Services Program.