There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reproductive Rights are Human Rights Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to include in the Annual Country Reports on Human Rights Practices a section on reproductive rights, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/07/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/07/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (140)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 03/07/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/07/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/07/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. [D-IL-4]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 03/07/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/07/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/07/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/14/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/14/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 03/14/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 03/14/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 03/14/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/14/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 04/03/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/03/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 05/07/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 05/07/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/07/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 05/23/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/05/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/06/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/07/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.