There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

First Responder Access to Innovative Technologies Act

Short Titles as Introduced

First Responder Access to Innovative Technologies Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish a process to review applications for certain grants to purchase equipment or systems that do not meet or exceed any applicable national voluntary consensus standards, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
05/14/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3755)
03/07/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/15/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
05/14/2019-4:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/14/2019-4:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3755)
05/14/2019-4:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1594.
05/14/2019-4:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3755-3756)
05/14/2019-4:08pmHouseMs. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/07/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/07/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 05/09/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/07/2019 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/15/2019 Referred to

As of 10/01/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1594 - First Responder Access to Innovative Technologies Act


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1594. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (05/14/2019)

First Responder Access to Innovative Technologies Act

This bill directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to implement a uniform process for reviewing applications for certain anti-terrorism grants to urban areas and state, local, and tribal governments. Specifically, the uniform review must be done for grant applications requesting to purchase first responder equipment or systems that do not meet or exceed any applicable national voluntary consensus standards.