There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Alan Reinstein Ban Asbestos Now Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Toxic Substances Control Act to prohibit the manufacture, processing, and distribution in commerce of asbestos and asbestos-containing mixtures and articles, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/07/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
11/19/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 1.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/19/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/26/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change
09/26/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change
05/13/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change
05/01/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change
03/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/07/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/07/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/07/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 03/07/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/07/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/11/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/13/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 03/21/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/21/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 03/21/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/25/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 04/25/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 04/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/07/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/07/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/14/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 05/14/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/13/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/21/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/30/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 08/27/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 08/27/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 09/20/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 11/01/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/20/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/02/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 02/06/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 02/18/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/07/2019 Referred to
11/19/2019 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change03/08/2019 Referred to
05/13/2019 Hearings by
09/26/2019 Markup by
09/26/2019 Reported by
House Education and Labor03/07/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1603. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/07/2019)

Alan Reinstein Ban Asbestos Now Act of 2019

This bill prohibits the manufacturing, processing, and distribution of asbestos or any mixture or article containing asbestos.

The bill authorizes the President to grant exemptions from this prohibition if it is necessary to protect national security interests and no feasible alternative exists for the intended use of the asbestos-containing product.

Any person who has manufactured, processed, or distributed asbestos or any mixture or article containing asbestos in the 36 months preceding the enactment of this bill (as well as those acting within the year after enactment but before the prohibition takes effect) must submit a report to the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) including information such as the location of the facility where the manufacturing occurred.

Additionally, the EPA must submit a report assessing the presence of asbestos in any residential, commercial, industrial, public, and school buildings as well as the extent of exposure and risk to human health. The report must include recommendations for modifications or additions to statutes, regulations, policies, and programs aimed at protecting against exposures to legacy asbestos.