There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fairness to Pet Owners Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote competition and help consumers save money by giving them the freedom to choose where they buy prescription pet medications, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/07/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/07/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (13)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/07/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 05/20/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/21/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/03/2019
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 07/24/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 09/11/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/16/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/16/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/18/2019
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 06/11/2019 06/13/2019 H4687

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/07/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1607. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/07/2019)

Fairness to Pet Owners Act of 2019

This bill directs the Federal Trade Commission to require a prescriber of a household-animal medication to provide a free copy of the prescription to the pet owner without the pet owner having the request a copy.