There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Nicholas and Zachary Burt Carbon Monoxide Poisoning Prevention Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Nicholas and Zachary Burt Carbon Monoxide Poisoning Prevention Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Nicholas and Zachary Burt Carbon Monoxide Poisoning Prevention Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To encourage States to require the installation of residential carbon monoxide detectors in homes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
09/17/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7723-7724)
09/16/2019Committee on House Administration discharged.
09/16/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-208, Part I.
03/07/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
09/18/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
09/17/2019-4:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/17/2019-4:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7723-7724)
09/17/2019-4:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7723-7727)
09/17/2019-4:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1618.
09/17/2019-4:12pmHouseMs. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/16/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 165.
09/16/2019HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
09/16/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-208, Part I.
07/17/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/17/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/10/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce
07/10/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce
06/13/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce
03/08/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/07/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/07/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/07/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/07/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
09/16/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-208
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce03/08/2019 Referred to
06/13/2019 Hearings by
07/10/2019 Markup by
07/10/2019 Reported by
House Administration03/07/2019 Referred to
09/16/2019 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/18/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1618. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/07/2019)

Nicholas and Zachary Burt Memorial Carbon Monoxide Poisoning Prevention Act of 2019

This bill directs the Consumer Product Safety Commission to establish a grant program to provide assistance to states for specified activities related to the prevention of carbon monoxide poisoning, including installation of alarms in certain dwellings and facilities.