There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys, to study and make recommendations to address social problems affecting Black men and boys, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/07/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/07/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/03/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 04/03/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/03/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 04/03/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/03/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/03/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 04/03/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 04/03/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 04/03/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/03/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/03/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/03/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/03/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 04/03/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 04/03/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/03/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/03/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/03/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/03/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/03/2019
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/03/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/03/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/03/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 04/03/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/03/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/03/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 04/03/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/03/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/03/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/03/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/03/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/03/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/03/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/12/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 04/15/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/18/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 04/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/25/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 04/25/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/25/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/29/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 04/29/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 05/01/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 05/01/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/15/2019
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 05/15/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 05/15/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/15/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 05/17/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 05/17/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 06/14/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 06/14/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 06/14/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/14/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 06/14/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/14/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/07/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties04/12/2019 Referred to

As of 06/18/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1636 - Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys Act.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1636. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/07/2019)

Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys Act

This bill establishes the Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys within the U.S. Commission on Civil Rights Office of the Staff Director to make a systematic study of the conditions affecting black men and boys.