There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

RE-VAC Act
Returning Essential Rural Veterinary Animal Care Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize assistance to be provided under certain rural development programs for the establishment or expansion of animal care facilities or veterinary practices in rural areas.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/10/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/24/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 05/24/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/24/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 06/18/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture03/08/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit04/03/2019 Referred to

As of 02/29/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1651 - RE-VAC Act


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1651. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/08/2019)

Returning Essential Rural Veterinary Animal Care Act or the RE-VAC Act

This bill authorizes the Department of Agriculture to provide certain loans and grants for the establishment or expansion of animal care facilities or veterinary practices in rural areas.