There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (10)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Internet of Things Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2020
IoT Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2020

Short Titles as Reported to House

Internet of Things Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2019
IoT Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Internet of Things Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2019
IoT Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Internet of Things Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2020
IoT Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To establish minimum security standards for Internet of Things devices owned or controlled by the Federal Government, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To leverage Federal Government procurement power to encourage increased cybersecurity for Internet of Things devices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
11/24/2020Presented to President.
11/17/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7043-7044)
09/14/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/14/2020Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
09/14/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 116-501, Part I.
03/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/24/2020HousePresented to President.
11/18/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/17/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7043-7044)
09/15/2020SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/14/2020-3:20pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/14/2020-3:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/14/2020-3:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4351-4352)
09/14/2020-3:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1668.
09/14/2020-3:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4351-4354)
09/14/2020-3:04pmHouseMrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/14/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 402.
09/14/2020HouseCommittee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
09/14/2020HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 116-501, Part I.
06/12/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
06/12/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
03/11/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
03/11/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/11/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/11/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform03/11/2019 Referred to
06/12/2019 Markup by
09/14/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-501
House Science, Space, and Technology03/11/2019 Referred to
09/14/2020 Discharged from
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Research and Technology03/11/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1668. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/11/2019)

Internet of Things Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2019 or the IoT Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2019

This bill requires the National Institute of Standards and Technology (NIST) and the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to take specified steps to increase cybersecurity for Internet of Things (IoT) devices. IoT is the extension of Internet connectivity into physical devices and everyday objects.

The bill establishes September 30, 2019, as the deadline for the completion of NIST's efforts regarding considerations for managing IoT cybersecurity risks, especially regarding examples of possible cybersecurity capabilities of IoT devices. By March 31, 2020, NIST must develop recommendations for the appropriate use and management of IoT devices owned or controlled by the government, including minimum information security requirements for managing cybersecurity risks.

The OMB shall then issue guidelines for each agency that are consistent with such recommendations.

NIST and the OMB shall publish guidance on policies and procedures for the reporting, coordinating, publishing, and receiving of information about a security vulnerability relating to an IoT device used by the government and the resolution of such security vulnerability.