There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

GAAME Act of 2019
Guarantee Access to Arts and Music Education Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to expand access to school-wide arts and music programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/11/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 03/11/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. [D-IL-4]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/11/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/11/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 03/13/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/29/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 06/26/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/02/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 08/02/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/20/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor03/11/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1676. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/11/2019)

Guarantee Access to Arts and Music Education Act of 2019 or the GAAME Act of 2019

This bill specifies that funds that support the instructional needs of elementary and secondary students from low-income families shall be used for arts and music programs.