There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Access to Medicare Coverage Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to count a period of receipt of outpatient observation services in a hospital toward satisfying the 3-day inpatient hospital stay requirement for coverage of skilled nursing facility services under Medicare, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
03/13/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/12/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/13/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/13/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/13/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/13/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/13/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/13/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/13/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/13/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/13/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 03/13/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 03/13/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/13/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/13/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/18/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/18/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/18/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/25/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/29/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/29/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/02/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 04/02/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/02/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/08/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/08/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/08/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/08/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/08/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 04/15/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 04/18/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/21/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/21/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 05/21/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/05/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/05/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/05/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/06/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/10/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/10/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/14/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/14/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/14/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 06/20/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/20/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 07/16/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 07/16/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/23/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/30/2019
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 08/06/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 08/09/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 09/11/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 10/21/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/08/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 11/14/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 02/10/2020
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 02/27/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/12/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/12/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce03/12/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/13/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1682. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/12/2019)

Improving Access to Medicare Coverage Act of 2019

This bill deems an individual receiving outpatient observation services in a hospital as an inpatient for purposes of satisfying the three-day inpatient hospital-stay requirement with respect to Medicare coverage of skilled nursing facility services.