There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Native American Voting Rights Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect the voting rights of Native American and Alaska Native voters.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
05/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/12/2019Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/2019Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (110)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 03/12/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/12/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/12/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/12/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 03/12/2019
Del. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/13/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/13/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 03/13/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 03/13/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/13/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/13/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 03/18/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/18/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 03/21/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/01/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 04/30/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 05/09/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/24/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/24/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 07/24/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 09/09/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 11/13/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 12/05/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/06/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 02/25/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/28/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/08/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/01/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/16/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/29/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/11/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 09/11/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 09/11/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/11/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/11/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/17/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/23/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 10/27/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/05/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 12/03/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Committee on House Administration03/12/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary03/12/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties05/03/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1694. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/12/2019)

Native American Voting Rights Act of 2019

This bill modifies the voting rights of Native American and Alaska Native voters. Changes made by the bill include the following:

  • expanding the types of facilities that can be used as voter registration agencies,
  • increasing polling site accessibility,
  • providing enforcement power to citizens and attorneys general,
  • requiring approval for actions like moving a polling place,
  • validating certain tribal identification for voting or registering, and
  • expanding requirements for bilingual voting accessibility.

The bill also establishes a Native American voting task force grant program for the purpose of increasing voter outreach, education, registration, turnout, and accessibility for Native American communities.