There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Community Services Block Grant Reauthorization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Community Services Block Grant Act to reauthorize and modernize the Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/12/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (127)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/12/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/25/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/25/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 03/25/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/25/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/25/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/25/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 03/25/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/25/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/25/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 03/25/2019
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/25/2019
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/25/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 03/25/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/25/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 03/25/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 03/25/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/01/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 04/01/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 04/02/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 04/09/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 04/09/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 04/09/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/30/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/30/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/01/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/20/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/20/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 06/04/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 06/04/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/11/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 06/11/2019
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/12/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 06/20/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/20/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/25/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 06/25/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/27/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/27/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/11/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/11/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/16/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 07/16/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/16/2019
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/16/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/16/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/16/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/18/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 07/18/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 07/23/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 07/23/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/24/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/24/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/24/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/24/2019
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/25/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/30/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/30/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 07/30/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/30/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/30/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/30/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 07/30/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 07/30/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 07/30/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 07/30/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 07/30/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 07/30/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 07/30/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/30/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 08/06/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 08/06/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 08/16/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 08/16/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 08/16/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 08/16/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 08/16/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 08/27/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/06/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 09/06/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 09/06/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 09/10/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/11/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/17/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 09/17/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 09/17/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/19/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/19/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 09/25/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 10/08/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 10/08/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 10/08/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 10/11/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 10/11/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/15/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/15/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/16/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/17/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 10/21/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 10/23/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/28/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/28/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/28/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/29/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/30/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/30/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 11/01/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/01/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/01/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/08/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/08/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 11/08/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 11/08/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 11/13/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/14/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/14/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 11/14/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/14/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor03/12/2019 Referred to

As of 11/17/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1695 - Community Services Block Grant Reauthorization Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.