There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Lonnie Kilpatrick Central Pacific Relief Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for a presumption of service-connection for certain veterans exposed to certain herbicides while serving in the Armed Forces, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/13/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (92)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 04/02/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 04/02/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 04/02/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/02/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 04/02/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/02/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/02/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/02/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 05/01/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/01/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 05/01/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/01/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/01/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/01/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/01/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/01/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/01/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/01/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/01/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/22/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/22/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/22/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 05/22/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/22/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 05/22/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 05/22/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/10/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/10/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 06/10/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/10/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 06/10/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/28/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/28/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 06/28/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 06/28/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 07/12/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 07/12/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/12/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/16/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/16/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/17/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/17/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 07/24/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 07/24/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 08/02/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 08/02/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 08/02/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 08/09/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/09/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 09/06/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 09/06/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/06/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/12/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/12/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/01/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/01/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 10/23/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/23/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/23/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 10/23/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 10/23/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 10/29/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 10/29/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/08/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 11/08/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/18/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/05/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 12/05/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/05/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/05/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 12/23/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 12/23/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/23/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 01/07/2020
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 01/07/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/07/2020
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 01/15/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/15/2020
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 01/24/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 01/24/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/24/2020
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/28/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 03/03/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/11/2020
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/11/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/13/2019 Referred to

As of 08/04/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1713 - Lonnie Kilpatrick Central Pacific Relief Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1713. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/13/2019)

Lonnie Kilpatrick Central Pacific Relief Act

This bill provides a presumption of service-connection for diseases associated with exposure to certain herbicide agents to veterans who served on (1) Guam or American Samoa, or in the territorial waters thereof between January 9, 1962, and July 31, 1980; or (2) Johnston Atoll or a ship that went to Johnston Atoll between January 1, 1972, and September 30, 1977. Under a presumption of service-connection, specific diseases diagnosed in certain veterans are presumed to have been caused by the circumstances of their military service. Health care benefits and disability compensation may then be awarded.

Additionally, the bill expands eligibility for hospital care, medical services, and nursing home care to veterans with a disability associated with exposure to certain herbicides during specified times of military service on Guam, American Samoa, or Johnston Atoll.