There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Militarizing Law Enforcement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Defense to make certain limitations on the transfer of personal property to Federal and State agencies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/14/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/13/2019Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (120)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/13/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 03/13/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/13/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/13/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/13/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/13/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/25/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/08/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/15/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/10/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/02/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/27/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 06/04/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/04/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/04/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/04/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 06/04/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/04/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 06/04/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/04/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/04/2020
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/11/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 06/11/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/15/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/15/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 06/15/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 06/15/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/15/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/15/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/15/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/15/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/15/2020
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 06/15/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 06/15/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 06/15/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/15/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/15/2020
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/15/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/15/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/15/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 07/09/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/09/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/09/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/09/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/09/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 07/09/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/09/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/09/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/09/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 07/09/2020
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 07/16/2020
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/29/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/29/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services03/13/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness03/14/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1714. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/13/2019)

Stop Militarizing Law Enforcement Act

This bill restricts the Department of Defense (DOD) from transferring certain surplus military property to federal, state, or local law enforcement agencies.

Specifically, DOD may not transfer to such agencies property such as controlled firearms, ammunition, bayonets, grenades or grenade launchers, explosives, certain vehicles or trucks, armored or weaponized drones, certain controlled aircraft, silencers, or long-range acoustic devices.

As a condition for such a transfer, DOD must require the federal or state agency that receives the property to return the property if the agency is investigated by the Department of Justice for civil liberties violations or is otherwise found to have engaged in widespread abuses of civil liberties. DOD must also periodically submit certain transfer-related information and certifications to Congress.

Furthermore, as a condition for transfer, the recipient must receive the approval of its local governing body, provide specified notice to the local community, and submit specified information and certifications to DOD. A federal or state agency that receives controlled property under such a transfer may never take ownership of the property.

The bill also eliminates the requirement for DOD to give preference to transfers of property that will be used in counter-drug, counterterrorism, or border security activities.