There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Coastal Communities Ocean Acidification Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Coastal Communities Ocean Acidification Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Coastal Communities Ocean Acidification Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Commerce, acting through the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, to conduct coastal community vulnerability assessments related to ocean acidification, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/05/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4325-4326)
05/23/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-81.
03/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/10/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
06/05/2019-9:40amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/05/2019-9:40amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4325-4326)
06/05/2019-9:28amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1716.
06/05/2019-9:28amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4325-4327)
06/05/2019-9:28amHouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/23/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 56.
05/23/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-81.
05/01/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
05/01/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
04/09/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment
04/09/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment
03/13/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
03/13/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
03/13/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (18)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology03/13/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Markup by
05/23/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-81
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment03/13/2019 Referred to
04/09/2019 Markup by
04/09/2019 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/10/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1716. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (06/05/2019)

Coastal Communities Ocean Acidification Act of 2019

This bill requires the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to conduct and update at least once every seven years an ocean acidification coastal community vulnerability assessment with a corresponding public report. The assessment must identify (1) U.S. coastal communities that are most dependent on coastal and ocean resources that may be impacted by ocean acidification; (2) the nature of those communities' vulnerabilities, including the economic impact on local or regional commercial fisheries and recreational opportunities; and (3) key knowledge gaps where research could be devoted to better understand the possible ocean acidification impacts and possible adaptation strategies for the communities.

In carrying out the assessment, NOAA must collaborate with state, U.S. territory, local, and tribal government entities that are conducting or have completed vulnerability assessments, strategic research planning, or other similar activities related to ocean acidification to determine whether those activities may serve as a model for others and to identify opportunities for federal agencies to support those activities.