There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Cancer Drug Parity Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to require group and individual health insurance coverage and group health plans to provide for cost sharing for oral anticancer drugs on terms no less favorable than the cost sharing provided for anticancer medications administered by a health care provider.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/13/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (111)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 03/13/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/13/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 03/13/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/14/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/14/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 03/25/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/25/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/25/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/25/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/25/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/02/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/04/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/04/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/09/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/09/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 04/15/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/15/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 05/02/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/07/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/07/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/07/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/07/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 05/10/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 05/10/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/16/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/17/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/17/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 05/20/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 05/20/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 05/20/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 05/23/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/23/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/23/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/23/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/23/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/23/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/23/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/23/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/06/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/06/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/06/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/06/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/06/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 06/06/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/06/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/06/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large] 06/06/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/06/2019
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/12/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/12/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 06/18/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/18/2019
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/19/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/19/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/24/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/24/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/09/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/09/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 07/11/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/11/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/17/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/17/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/30/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 08/09/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 08/09/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 08/23/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 08/23/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/16/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/16/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 09/19/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 09/19/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 09/26/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 09/26/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 11/08/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 11/08/2019
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/08/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 11/08/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 11/13/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 11/13/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/19/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/19/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 11/22/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 11/22/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 12/03/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 12/03/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 12/10/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 12/10/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 12/11/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 12/11/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 12/11/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/13/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1730. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/13/2019)

Cancer Drug Parity Act of 2019

This bill requires health plans that cover anticancer medications administered by a health care provider to provide no less favorable cost sharing for patient-administered anticancer medications. This requirement applies to medications that are (1) approved by the Food and Drug Administration; (2) medically necessary for the cancer treatment; and (3) clinically appropriate in terms of type, frequency, extent site, and duration.

To comply with this requirement, health plans may not, with respect to anticancer medications (1) change or replace benefits to increase out-of-pocket costs, (2) reclassify benefits to increase costs, or (3) apply more restrictive limitations to orally administered medications than to intravenously administered or injected medications.