There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Violence Against Women Extension Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize Department of Justice programs that combat violence against women, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
05/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/13/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 03/25/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/28/2019
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 03/28/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/28/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/28/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 03/28/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/28/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/28/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/28/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/28/2019
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 03/28/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/28/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 03/28/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/01/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 04/01/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 04/01/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/01/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 04/01/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/01/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 04/01/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/01/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/01/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/01/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 04/01/2019
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/01/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/01/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/01/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/01/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 04/01/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/02/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 04/02/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 04/02/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 04/02/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 04/02/2019
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 04/02/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 04/02/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 04/02/2019
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/02/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 04/02/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/03/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 04/03/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/03/2019
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/03/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 04/03/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 04/03/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 04/03/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 04/03/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/04/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 04/04/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 04/04/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/04/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 04/04/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/04/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 04/04/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/08/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/08/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/15/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 05/15/2019

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/13/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/03/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce03/13/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources03/13/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States04/03/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services03/13/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.