There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

PFC Joseph P. Dwyer Peer Support Program Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to make grants to State and local entities to carry out peer-to-peer mental health programs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/13/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/13/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 03/13/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/13/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/01/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/01/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 05/07/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 05/20/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/26/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/27/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/27/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/28/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/28/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 07/05/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/05/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/09/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 07/11/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 07/11/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 08/16/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/10/2019
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 09/11/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 09/11/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/18/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/25/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 09/27/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/08/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 10/08/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 10/15/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/15/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/17/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 12/19/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 01/28/2020
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 01/29/2020
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 01/30/2020
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 02/03/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 02/03/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/10/2020
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 02/12/2020
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/13/2020
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 03/05/2020
Rep. Rose, John W. [R-TN-6] 09/01/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs03/13/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1749.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1749. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/13/2019)

PFC Joseph P. Dwyer Peer Support Program Act

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish the P.F.C. Joseph P. Dwyer Peer Support program to make grants to eligible entities for peer-to-peer mental health programs for veterans.

Eligible entities include (1) a nonprofit organization having historically served the mental health needs of veterans; (2) a congressionally chartered veteran service organization; or (3) a state, local, or tribal veteran service agency, director, or commissioner.

The VA shall establish an advisory committee to create appropriate program standards.