There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act with respect to permitting terms, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/14/2019Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/18/2019
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/18/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/21/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 04/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/14/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment03/15/2019 Referred to

As of 04/22/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1764 - To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act with respect to permitting terms, and for other purposes..


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.