There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Student Agriculture Protection Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to exclude from gross income certain amounts realized on the disposition of property raised or produced by a student agriculturist, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/14/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/21/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 03/21/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/21/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/21/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/21/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/21/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/21/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 03/21/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/21/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 03/21/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/21/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/21/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/21/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/21/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 03/25/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/25/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/26/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 03/26/2019
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/27/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/01/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/08/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 04/08/2019
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/08/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/08/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/10/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/09/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/09/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/09/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 05/09/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 05/09/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 05/09/2019
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/10/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/10/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 05/10/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/10/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 05/15/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 05/15/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/15/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 05/15/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/15/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/15/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/15/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 05/22/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/30/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 06/03/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 06/12/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/27/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/18/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 01/29/2020
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 02/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/14/2019 Referred to

As of 04/04/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1770 - Student Agriculture Protection Act of 2019


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1770. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/14/2019)

Student Agriculture Protection Act of 2019

This bill modifies the requirements for calculating taxable income to exclude from the gross income of a student agriculturist up to $5,000 of the gain from the sale or exchange of personal property (including livestock, crops, and agricultural mechanics or shop products) produced or raised by the student agriculturist.

A "student agriculturist" is an individual who is under 22 years of age and is enrolled in (1) an FFA (Future Farmers of America) chapter or a program established by the National FFA Organization; (2) a 4H Club or other program established by 4H; or (3) a student agriculture program that is under the direction or guidance of an agricultural educator, advisor, or club leader.