There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Divided Families Reunification Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Divided Families Reunification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require consultations on reuniting Korean Americans with family members in North Korea.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
03/09/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 391 - 0 (Roll no. 92).
03/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/10/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
03/09/2020-7:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/09/2020-7:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 391 - 0 (Roll no. 92). (text: CR H1547)
03/09/2020-7:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1549)
03/09/2020-4:50pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/09/2020-4:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1771.
03/09/2020-4:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1547-1548)
03/09/2020-4:44pmHouseMr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/30/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
10/30/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/02/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/14/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/14/2019HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E307)
03/14/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/14/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 03/14/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/21/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/21/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 03/21/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 04/01/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 04/02/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 04/12/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 05/07/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 05/24/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/03/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/03/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/10/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 06/18/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/19/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/24/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 06/27/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/09/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/09/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 07/09/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/11/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 07/12/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 07/17/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/17/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/25/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 09/06/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 09/10/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 10/28/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/29/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/30/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/30/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/01/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 11/08/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 11/08/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 01/07/2020
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/18/2020
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 03/09/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/14/2019 Referred to
10/30/2019 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation04/02/2019 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations03/10/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1771. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (03/09/2020)

Divided Families Reunification Act

This bill directs the Department of State to periodically report to Congress on its consultations with South Korea on potential opportunities to reunite Korean Americans with family in North Korea. The State Department's Special Envoy on North Korean Human Rights Issues shall periodically report to Congress on its consultations with representatives of Korean Americans with family in North Korea on reunification efforts.