There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles 10 and 38, United States Code, to authorize a person awarded the Medal of Honor to designate an individual to receive the special pension after death, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 04/30/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/09/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/08/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/18/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/14/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services03/14/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel03/15/2019 Referred to

As of 11/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1779 - To amend titles 10 and 38, United States Code, to authorize a person awarded the Medal of Honor to designate an individual to receive the special pension after death, and for other purposes.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.