There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Payment Commission Data Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Payment Commission Data Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Payment Commission Data Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles XVIII and XIX of the Social Security Act to provide the Medicare Payment Advisory Commission and the Medicaid and CHIP Payment and Access Commission with access to certain drug payment information, including certain rebate information.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
10/28/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8526)
10/28/2019Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
10/28/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-257, Part I.
03/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/29/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
10/28/2019-7:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/28/2019-7:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8526)
10/28/2019-7:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1781.
10/28/2019-7:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8526-8527)
10/28/2019-7:37pmHouseMs. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/28/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 205.
10/28/2019HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
10/28/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-257, Part I.
04/03/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/03/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/27/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
03/27/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
03/15/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/14/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/14/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/14/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/14/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (29)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce03/14/2019 Referred to
04/03/2019 Markup by
10/28/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-257
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/15/2019 Referred to
03/27/2019 Markup by
03/27/2019 Reported by
House Ways and Means03/14/2019 Referred to
10/28/2019 Discharged from
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/14/2019 Referred to
Senate Finance10/29/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1781. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (10/28/2019)

Payment Commission Data Act of 2019

This bill allows certain payment information relating to covered drugs under the Medicare prescription drug benefit and Medicaid to be disclosed to additional entities. Specifically, certain subsidy and rebate information, as reported by prescription drug plan sponsors and drug manufacturers, may be disclosed to the Medicare Payment Advisory Commission and the Medicaid and Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) Payment and Access Commission, in accordance with specified confidentiality restrictions.