There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act and the Dingell-Johnson Sport Fish Restoration Act, to provide parity for United States territories and the District of Columbia, to make technical corrections to such Acts and related laws, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/10/2019Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-144.
03/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
07/10/2019Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 106.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/10/2019Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-144.
05/01/2019Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
05/01/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/01/2019Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
03/26/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
03/20/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/18/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/18/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/18/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Markup by
07/10/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-144
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife03/20/2019 Referred to
03/26/2019 Hearings by
05/01/2019 Discharged from

As of 09/17/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1809 - To amend the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act and the Dingell-Johnson Sport Fish Restoration Act, to provide parity for United States territories and the District of Columbia, to make technical corrections to such Acts and related laws, and for other purposes.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1809. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (07/10/2019)

This bill requires the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service to apportion certain wildlife-restoration funds to the U.S. territories and the District of Columbia in the same manner as such funds are apportioned under current law to the states.