There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SEC Disclosure Effectiveness Testing Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

SEC Disclosure Effectiveness Testing Act

Short Titles as Introduced

SEC Disclosure Effectiveness Testing Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Securities and Exchange Commission, when developing rules and regulations about disclosures to retail investors, to conduct investor testing, including a survey and interviews of retail investors, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/17/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 229 - 186 (Roll no. 564).
06/20/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-123.
03/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (36)

Date Chamber
10/21/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
10/17/2019-3:05pmHouseThe Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1815.
10/17/2019-3:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/17/2019-3:05pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 229 - 186 (Roll no. 564).
10/17/2019-2:30pmHouseThe House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
10/17/2019-2:30pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
10/17/2019-2:29pmHouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1815.
10/17/2019-2:29pmHouseH.Amdt.629 On agreeing to the Wagner amendment (A003) Failed by recorded vote: 188 - 230 (Roll no. 563).
10/17/2019-2:23pmHouseH.Amdt.628 On agreeing to the Gottheimer amendment (A002) Agreed to by recorded vote: 240 - 178 (Roll no. 562).
10/17/2019-2:17pmHouseH.Amdt.627 On agreeing to the Huizenga amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 188 - 229 (Roll no. 561).
10/17/2019-1:46pmHouseH.Amdt.630 On agreeing to the Casten (IL) amendment (A004) Agreed to by voice vote.
10/17/2019-1:42pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 629, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Casten (IL) amendment No. 4.
10/17/2019-1:41pmHouseH.Amdt.630 Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Casten (IL). (consideration: CR H8219-8220; text: CR H8219)
10/17/2019-1:40pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Wagner amendment, the Chair put the question on the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mrs. Wagner demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the amendment until a time to be announced.
10/17/2019-1:29pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 629, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Wagner amendment No. 3.
10/17/2019-1:28pmHouseH.Amdt.629 Amendment (A003) offered by Mrs. Wagner. (consideration: CR H8218-8219, H8221-8222; text: CR H8218)
10/17/2019-1:28pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Gottheimer amendment, the Chair put the question on the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Gottheimer demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the amendment until a time to be announced.
10/17/2019-1:18pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 629, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Gottheimer amendment No. 2.
10/17/2019-1:17pmHouseH.Amdt.628 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Gottheimer. (consideration: CR H8217-8218, H8220-8221; text: CR H8217)
10/17/2019-1:17pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Huizenga amendment, the Chair put the question on the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Huizenga demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the amendment until a time to be announced.
10/17/2019-1:06pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 629, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Huizenga amendment No. 1.
10/17/2019-1:05pmHouseH.Amdt.627 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Huizenga. (consideration: CR H8216-8217, H8220; text: CR H8216)
10/17/2019-12:23pmHouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1815.
10/17/2019-12:23pmHouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 629 and Rule XVIII.
10/17/2019-12:23pmHouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable James R. Langevin to act as Chairman of the Committee.
10/17/2019-12:17pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1815 and H.R. 3624 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order.
10/17/2019-12:17pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 629. (consideration: CR H8209-8224; text: CR H8215-8216)
10/15/2019-6:42pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 629 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1815 and H.R. 3624 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order.
06/20/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 91.
06/20/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-123.
03/28/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 26.
03/28/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/27/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/26/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/18/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
03/18/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/18/2019 Referred to
03/28/2019 Markup by
06/20/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-123
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs10/21/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1815. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (10/17/2019)

SEC Disclosure Effectiveness Testing Act

This bill requires the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) to assess the usefulness of certain disclosure rules to retail investors. Specifically, the SEC must make these assessments regarding both current and new securities rules and regulations that require the disclosure of documents or information to retail investors.