There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Firearm Due Process Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enforce the requirement that the National Instant Criminal Background Check System make a final disposition of requests to correct its records within 60 days, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/18/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/18/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 03/18/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 03/18/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 03/25/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/25/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/26/2019
Rep. Tiffany, Thomas P. [R-WI-7] 08/11/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary03/18/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/03/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1817.


Latest Summary (0)

With the start of a new Congress, summaries from prior Congresses may be delayed or abbreviated.