There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the authorization for the Cape Cod National Seashore Advisory Commission.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/20/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9072)
11/08/2019Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-272.
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
11/21/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
11/20/2019-1:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/20/2019-1:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9072)
11/20/2019-1:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 182.
11/20/2019-1:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9072-9074)
11/20/2019-1:33pmHouseMr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/08/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 217.
11/08/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-272.
09/18/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/18/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/18/2019HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
05/22/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
02/05/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/03/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/03/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/03/2019 Referred to
09/18/2019 Markup by
11/08/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-272
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands02/05/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Hearings by
09/18/2019 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources11/21/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.182. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (11/08/2019)

This bill extends the Cape Cod National Seashore Advisory Commission through September 25, 2028.