There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 35 Tulip Avenue in Floral Park, New York, as the "Lieutenant Michael R. Davidson Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
03/12/2020Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
10/16/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8170)
03/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/12/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 445.
03/12/2020SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
03/11/2020SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/17/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
10/16/2019-3:16pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/16/2019-3:16pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8170)
10/16/2019-3:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1833.
10/16/2019-3:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8170-8171)
10/16/2019-3:12pmHouseMr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/12/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
06/12/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
03/18/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
03/18/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform03/18/2019 Referred to
06/12/2019 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/17/2019 Referred to
03/11/2020 Markup by
03/12/2020 Reported by

As of 08/11/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1833 - To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 35 Tulip Avenue in Floral Park, New York, as the "Lieutenant Michael R. Davidson Post Office Building".


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1833. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/18/2019)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 35 Tulip Avenue in Floral Park, New York, as the "Lieutenant Michael R. Davidson Post Office Building."