There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Defending Our National Marine Sanctuaries from Damaging Chemicals Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Commerce to issue regulations prohibiting the use of sunscreen containing oxybenzone or octinoxate in a National Marine Sanctuary in which coral is present, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/18/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/18/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 03/18/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/25/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 03/26/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/18/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife04/08/2019 Referred to

As of 10/21/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1834 - Defending Our National Marine Sanctuaries from Damaging Chemicals Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1834. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/18/2019)

Defending Our National Marine Sanctuaries from Damaging Chemicals Act of 2019

This bill prohibits the use of sunscreen containing oxybenzone or octinoxate in a National Marine Sanctuary that contains coral.