There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Jobs Opportunity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to establish a small business start-up tax credit for veterans creating businesses in underserved communities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/17/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/17/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 01/17/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 01/17/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 01/17/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/17/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/17/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/17/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/17/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/17/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/17/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/17/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/17/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/17/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/17/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 01/17/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 01/17/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/17/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/17/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 01/17/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/17/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/17/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/17/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/17/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 01/17/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/17/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 01/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/22/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 02/08/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 04/18/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/18/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/07/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/19/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 08/30/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 09/06/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/03/2019 Referred to

As of 09/17/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.186 - Veterans Jobs Opportunity Act


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.186. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2019)

Veterans Jobs Opportunity Act

This bill allows a new business-related tax credit for the start-up expenses of a veteran-owned small business in an underserved community.

The allowable amount of such credit is 15% of start-up expenditures that do not exceed $80,000. To be eligible for the credit, the small business must (1) be owned and controlled by one or more veterans or spouses of veterans, and (2) have a principal place of business in an underserved community.

An "underserved community" is any area located within (1) a HUBZone (as defined by the Small Business Act), (2) an empowerment zone or an enterprise community, (3) an area of low income or moderate income (as recognized by the Federal Financial Institutions Examination Council), or (4) a county with persistent poverty (as classified by the Economic Research Service of the Department of Agriculture).