There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Women and Climate Change Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To address the disparate impact of climate change on women and support the efforts of women globally to address climate change, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/30/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/30/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/30/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 04/30/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/30/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 04/30/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/30/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/30/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 04/30/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 04/30/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/30/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/30/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/30/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 04/30/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 04/30/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/10/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/10/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/10/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 05/10/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 05/10/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 05/10/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 05/10/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 05/10/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/12/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/12/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/12/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/12/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/12/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/12/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/12/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/12/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/12/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 08/20/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 08/20/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/20/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/26/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce03/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1880. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/26/2019)

Women and Climate Change Act of 2019

This bill addresses climate change and its effects on women and girls.

Specifically, the bill establishes the Federal Interagency Working Group on Women and Climate Change within the Department of State. The bill outlines the functions of the working group, including the coordination of agencies' policies and activities relating to (1) combating the effects of climate change on women, and (2) improving the government's response to and strategy for climate change.

In addition, the Office of Global Women's Issues of the State Department must submit a strategy to prevent and respond to the effects of climate change on women.