There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (18)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Next Step Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Democracy Restoration Act of 2019
  • Dignity Act
  • Dignity for Incarcerated Women Act of 2019
  • ERRPA
  • End Racial and Religious Profiling Act of 2019
  • Fair Chance Act
  • Fair Chance Licensing Act of 2019
  • Fair Chance to Compete for Jobs Act of 2019
  • Marijuana Justice Act of 2019
  • New Pathways Act
  • PRIDE Act
  • Police Reporting Information, Data, and Evidence Act of 2019
  • REDEEM Act
  • Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment Act of 2019
  • Reverse Mass Incarceration Act of 2019
  • Smarter Sentencing Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reform sentencing, prisons, re-entry of prisoners, and law enforcement practices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date All Actions
04/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/27/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/26/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Armed Services, Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Armed Services, Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Armed Services, Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Armed Services, Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Armed Services, Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Armed Services, Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Armed Services, Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Armed Services, Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Armed Services, Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Armed Services, Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 04/01/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/12/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/04/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/04/2020

Committees (10)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/26/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security04/08/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce03/26/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/27/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services03/26/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture03/26/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations04/03/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources03/26/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States03/28/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform03/26/2019 Referred to
Committee on House Administration03/26/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services03/26/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor03/26/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (49)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.