There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Supporting Children of the National Guard and Reserve Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to expand the military student identifier program to cover students with a parent who serves in the reserve component of the Armed Forces.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/27/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E358)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/27/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 04/01/2019
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/01/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 04/01/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/03/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 04/03/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/03/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 04/04/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/09/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/18/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 04/18/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/18/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/29/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 04/29/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/29/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/02/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 05/02/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/02/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/02/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/07/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/07/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/07/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/10/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/10/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/10/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 05/14/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/14/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/16/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 05/17/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 05/22/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/22/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/22/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 06/04/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/04/2019
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/30/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 11/14/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor03/27/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1896. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/27/2019)

Supporting Children of the National Guard and Reserve Act

This bill expands the military student identifier program to include students of parents who serve in reserve components of the Armed Forces, not just active duty members. The military student identifier program provides educators with information about the educational experience of children of members of the Armed Forces.