There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DHS Acquisition Documentation Integrity Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

DHS Acquisition Documentation Integrity Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to provide for requirements relating to documentation for major acquisition programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/14/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3759-3760)
03/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
05/15/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
05/14/2019-4:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/14/2019-4:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3759-3760)
05/14/2019-4:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1912.
05/14/2019-4:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3759-3761)
05/14/2019-4:34pmHouseMs. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/08/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/27/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/27/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 05/14/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/27/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability04/08/2019 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/15/2019 Referred to

As of 09/21/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1912 - DHS Acquisition Documentation Integrity Act of 2019


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.