There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ocean Acidification Innovation Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Ocean Acidification Innovation Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize Federal agencies to establish prize competitions for innovation or adaptation management development relating to ocean acidification.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/05/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 22 (Roll no. 241).(text: CR H4327)
03/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/10/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
06/05/2019-10:33amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/05/2019-10:33amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 22 (Roll no. 241). (text: CR H4327)
06/05/2019-10:03amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4331-4331)
06/05/2019-9:51amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/05/2019-9:44amHouseDEBATE - The House continued debate on H.R. 1921.
06/05/2019-9:40amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1921.
06/05/2019-9:40amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4327-4329)
06/05/2019-9:40amHouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/09/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment
04/09/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment
03/27/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
03/27/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
03/27/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology03/27/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment03/27/2019 Referred to
04/09/2019 Markup by
04/09/2019 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/10/2019 Referred to

As of 09/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1921 - Ocean Acidification Innovation Act of 2019


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1921. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (06/05/2019)

Ocean Acidification Innovation Act of 2019

This bill authorizes a federal agency with a representative serving on the Interagency Working Group on Ocean Acidification to carry out a program that awards prizes competitively for innovative efforts to research or respond to ocean acidification. Priority must be given to establishing programs that address communities, environments, or industries that are in distress due to the impacts of ocean acidification.