There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Women's History and Nineteenth Amendment Centennial Quarter Dollar Coin Program Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 31, United States Code, to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue quarter dollars in commemoration of the Nineteenth Amendment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (92)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/30/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/30/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/30/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 05/20/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/20/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/20/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/20/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/20/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/20/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/20/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 05/20/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/20/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/20/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 05/20/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/20/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/20/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 05/20/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/20/2019
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 05/20/2019
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/20/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 05/20/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/20/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 05/20/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/23/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 05/28/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 06/03/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/03/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/04/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/04/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/04/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/04/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/04/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 06/04/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 06/05/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/05/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 06/05/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/06/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/06/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/10/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/10/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/10/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 06/11/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/13/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/14/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/18/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/18/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 06/18/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/18/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/19/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 06/24/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/24/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/24/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/24/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/24/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/25/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/27/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 07/05/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/10/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/12/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 07/16/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 07/16/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 07/22/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/22/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/22/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 07/22/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 07/22/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/23/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 07/24/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/24/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/24/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 07/24/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 07/24/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 07/30/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 07/30/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 08/06/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 08/06/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 08/13/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 08/13/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 08/16/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 08/27/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/27/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1923. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/27/2019)

Women's History and Nineteenth Amendment Centennial Quarter Dollar Coin Program Act

This bill requires the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue quarter-dollar coins in commemoration of the ratification of the Nineteenth Amendment granting women the right to vote. The design on the reverse of each coin shall be emblematic of the accomplishments and contributions of a prominent woman who was a resident of a state, the District of Columbia, or a U.S. territory.

Such coins shall be issued in alphabetical order of the area represented, starting with the state of Alabama.

Treasury shall

  • initiate a program to promote collection of the coins and recognition of their subjects, and
  • strike and make available for sale silver bullion coins that are the exact duplicates of the coins.