There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Wage Equity Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to enhance provisions related to pay discrimination, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/27/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/27/2019
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/27/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 03/27/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 03/27/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 03/29/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 04/01/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 04/01/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/02/2019
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/02/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 04/02/2019
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 04/18/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/18/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 04/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor03/27/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1935.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1935. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/27/2019)

Wage Equity Act of 2019

This bill addresses pay discrimination in the workplace between men and women.

Specifically, the bill

  • allows an employer to base a wage differential determination on an employee's participation in a flexible work arrangement;
  • protects employers who conduct a pay analysis audit to identify and correct pay discrimination from liability for damages relating to such discrimination;
  • makes it an unlawful practice for an employer to rely on the wage history of a prospective employee for hiring and wage determination purposes unless the wage history is voluntarily provided by the prospective employee;
  • makes it an unlawful practice for an employer to prohibit an employee from requesting wage information from another employee or from requesting information about wage differentials;
  • authorizes the Department of Labor to establish a grant program for negotiation skills training for women and girls; and
  • requires the Government Accountability Office to study and report on the causes and effects of pay disparities among men and women in the workplace and the impact on pay and opportunity for employees who leave the workforce for parental reasons.