There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Iran Human Rights and Hostage-Taking Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose additional sanctions with respect to serious human rights abuses of the Government of Iran, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
01/31/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/06/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 03/11/2019

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/03/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary01/03/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security01/03/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services01/03/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/03/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade01/31/2019 Referred to

As of 03/22/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.194 - Iran Human Rights and Hostage-Taking Accountability Act.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.