There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Coastal and Marine Economies Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act to prohibit the Secretary of the Interior including in any leasing program certain planning areas, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
06/19/2019Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 12.
06/19/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/19/2019Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
04/02/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
03/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/28/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/28/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/28/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 03/28/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/03/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 04/03/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 04/12/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/25/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/30/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/07/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/14/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/21/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/22/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/22/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/22/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/24/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/03/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/04/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/10/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/11/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/13/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 06/14/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 06/20/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/28/2019 Referred to
06/19/2019 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources03/28/2019 Referred to
04/02/2019 Hearings by
06/19/2019 Discharged from

As of 06/24/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1941 - Coastal and Marine Economies Protection Act.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1941. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/28/2019)

Coastal and Marine Economies Protection Act

This bill prohibits the Department of the Interior from offering any tract for oil and gas leasing or preleasing in the Atlantic Outer Continental Shelf planning area (North Atlantic, Mid-Atlantic, South Atlantic, and the Straits of Florida) or the Pacific Outer Continental Shelf planning area (Washington/Oregon, Northern California, Central California, and Southern California).