There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Intercountry Adoption Information Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Intercountry Adoption Information Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Intercountry Adoption Information Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Intercountry Adoption Information Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Intercountry Adoption Act of 2000 to require the Secretary of State to report on intercountry adoptions from countries which have significantly reduced adoption rates involving immigration to the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/30/2020Became Public Law No: 116-184. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/2020Signed by President.
10/20/2020Presented to President.
09/30/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/30/2020Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/20/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 397 - 0 (Roll no. 218).(text: CR H3973)
03/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/30/2020Became Public Law No: 116-184. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/2020Signed by President.
10/20/2020HousePresented to President.
09/30/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/30/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/30/2020SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5918)
05/21/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
05/20/2019-7:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/20/2019-7:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 397 - 0 (Roll no. 218). (text: CR H3973)
05/20/2019-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3995)
05/20/2019-4:38pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/20/2019-4:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1952.
05/20/2019-4:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3973-3975)
05/20/2019-4:29pmHouseMr. Castro (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/09/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/09/2019HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
04/09/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/28/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/28/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs03/28/2019 Referred to
04/09/2019 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations05/21/2019 Referred to
09/30/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1952. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-184 (10/30/2020)

Intercountry Adoption Information Act of 2019

This bill directs the Department of State to include additional information in its annual report to Congress on intercountry adoptions. The reports shall contain (1) a list of countries that have laws that prevent or prohibit adoptions by American parents; (2) various information related to such prohibitions; (3) what steps the State Department has taken to help such countries reopen intercountry adoptions; and (4) an assessment of the impact that certain fees have on families seeking to adopt international children, sibling groups, or children with disabilities.