There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Democracy Restoration Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To secure the Federal voting rights of persons when released from incarceration.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/03/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/03/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/28/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/07/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/26/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 07/09/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/10/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/15/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/23/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 08/09/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 01/29/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/03/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.196. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2019)

Democracy Restoration Act of 2019

This bill addresses the voting rights of persons convicted of a criminal offense and the restoration of their voting rights.

The bill declares that the right of a U.S. citizen to vote in any election for federal office shall not be denied or abridged because that individual has been convicted of a criminal offense unless, at the time of the election, such individual is serving a felony sentence. The bill provides for enforcement of, and remedies for violations of, the bill.

The bill sets forth requirements for state and federal notification of individuals of the restoration of their voting rights.

The bill prohibits federal funding of construction or improvement of a place of incarceration unless U.S. citizens incarcerated in that jurisdiction are notified, upon release, of their voting rights.