There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Women's Hall of Fame Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in recognition and celebration of the National Women's Hall of Fame.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/28/2019Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/28/2019Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/28/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/15/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/15/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/15/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/15/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/18/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/18/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 04/18/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/18/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/25/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 04/25/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/25/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 04/29/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 04/29/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/30/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/30/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 04/30/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 05/07/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 05/07/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/07/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/07/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/07/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/07/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/09/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/09/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/09/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/14/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/14/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/14/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/15/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/15/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/16/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/16/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/16/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 05/16/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/21/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 05/21/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 05/22/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 06/10/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/10/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/28/2019 Referred to
House Budget03/28/2019 Referred to

As of 07/22/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1982 - National Women's Hall of Fame Commemorative Coin Act


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.