There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Protect Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify seasoning requirements for certain refinanced mortgage loans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/09/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5274)
07/09/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-138, Part I.
03/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
07/10/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 143.
07/09/2019-4:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/09/2019-4:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5274)
07/09/2019-4:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1988.
07/09/2019-4:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5274-5276)
07/09/2019-4:31pmHouseMs. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/09/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-138, Part I.
05/01/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
05/01/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
05/01/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/28/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/28/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/28/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 03/28/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 06/13/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/09/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 07/09/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/28/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs03/28/2019 Referred to
07/09/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-138
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity05/01/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Markup by
05/01/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1988. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/28/2019)

Protect Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2019

This bill revises loan seasoning requirements related to a refinanced Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) housing loan. Under current law, the VA is prohibited from guaranteeing a refinanced home loan until the date that is the later of (1) the date on which the sixth monthly payment is made, or (2) the date that is 210 days after the first payment is made. This bill modifies this date to (1) when the borrower has made six consecutive monthly payments, or (2) 210 days after the first payment is due.