There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Second Chance at Life Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that a woman seeking a chemical abortion is informed that it may be possible to reverse the intended effects of the abortion if the woman changes her mind, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/01/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/01/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/01/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/02/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/02/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 04/02/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 04/02/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/02/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 04/04/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 04/04/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 04/04/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 04/04/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 04/08/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 04/08/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 04/08/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 04/08/2019
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/08/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/09/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 04/09/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/10/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 04/12/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 04/12/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/12/2019
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 04/12/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 04/12/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 04/22/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 04/29/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/30/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/30/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 05/01/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/01/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/01/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/01/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 05/03/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 05/09/2019
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 05/09/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/09/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/09/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/09/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/15/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/15/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 05/15/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/15/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/16/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/20/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 05/20/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 05/23/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/23/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/01/2019 Referred to

As of 06/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2010 - Second Chance at Life Act of 2019.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.