There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protect European Energy Security Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require reports by the Secretary of State and the Director of National Intelligence relating to construction of the Nord Stream 2 pipeline, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/02/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
05/22/2019Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
05/22/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/22/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/02/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/02/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/02/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 04/02/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 04/30/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/30/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/30/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/14/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/14/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/16/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/16/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/16/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/21/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/21/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/21/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 06/03/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/03/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 06/03/2019
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6] 06/13/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/13/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/13/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 06/13/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 06/25/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 06/25/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 06/28/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/02/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)04/02/2019 Referred to

As of 08/03/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2023 - Protect European Energy Security Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2023. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/02/2019)

Protect European Energy Security Act

This bill requires the submission of certain reports to Congress related to Russia's construction of two natural gas pipelines, the Nord Stream 2 and Turk Stream.

The Department of State shall report on (1) its efforts to promote energy security in Ukraine and the European Union and decrease their dependence on Russian energy sources, (2) its diplomatic efforts to oppose the pipelines, and (3) an estimate of European demand for natural gas from 2019 through 2023.

The Office of the Director of National Intelligence shall report on the impact of the Nord Stream 2 pipeline on (1) U.S. interests and security objectives; (2) European energy security and defense posture; (3) Russian influence in Europe; and (4) Ukraine, including the impact of reductions in transit fees due to the pipeline.