There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protect European Energy Security Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require reports by the Secretary of State and the Director of National Intelligence relating to construction of the Nord Stream 2 pipeline, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/02/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
05/22/2019Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
05/22/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/22/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/02/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/02/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/02/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 04/02/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 04/30/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/30/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/30/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/14/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/14/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/16/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/16/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/16/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/21/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/21/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/21/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 06/03/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/03/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 06/03/2019
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6] 06/13/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/13/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/13/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 06/13/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 06/25/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 06/25/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 06/28/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/02/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by
House Intelligence (Permanent)04/02/2019 Referred to

As of 11/22/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2023 - Protect European Energy Security Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.