There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan Authorization Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan Authorization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan Authorization Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan Authorization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to execute and carry out agreements concerning Colorado River Drought Contingency Management and Operations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
04/16/2019Became Public Law No: 116-14.
04/16/2019Signed by President.
04/10/2019Presented to President.
04/09/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2298)
04/08/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3112)
04/02/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
04/16/2019Became Public Law No: 116-14.
04/16/2019Signed by President.
04/10/2019HousePresented to President.
04/09/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/09/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2298)
04/08/2019-5:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/08/2019-5:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3112)
04/08/2019-5:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2030.
04/08/2019-5:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3112-3115)
04/08/2019-5:29pmHouseMr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/02/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
04/02/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3]* 04/02/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/02/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4]* 04/02/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/02/2019
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/03/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/03/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 04/03/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 04/03/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 04/03/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 04/08/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 04/08/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 04/08/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 04/08/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/02/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2030. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (04/09/2019)

Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan Authorization Act

This bill requires the Department of the Interior to carry out the Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan which was submitted to Congress on March 19, 2019, by Arizona, California, Colorado, Nevada, New Mexico, Utah, and Wyoming. Interior must execute the plan without delay and operate applicable Colorado River System reservoirs accordingly.