There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Saudi Arabia Human Rights and Accountability Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Saudi Arabia Human Rights and Accountability Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To encourage accountability for the murder of Washington Post columnist Jamal Khashoggi.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/15/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 7 (Roll no. 477).(text: CR H5796-5797)
04/02/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/16/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
07/15/2019-7:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/15/2019-7:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 7 (Roll no. 477). (text: CR H5796-5797)
07/15/2019-7:11pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5814)
07/15/2019-4:11pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/15/2019-3:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2037.
07/15/2019-3:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5796-5800)
07/15/2019-3:52pmHouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/26/2019HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
06/26/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/26/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/15/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/02/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/02/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/02/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/02/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (19)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs04/02/2019 Referred to
06/26/2019 Markup by
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)04/02/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary04/02/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship05/15/2019 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations07/16/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2037. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (07/15/2019)

Saudi Arabia Human Rights and Accountability Act of 2019

This bill requires the Office of the Director of National Intelligence (ODNI) to report to Congress about the killing of Washington Post columnist Jamal Khashoggi and imposes related sanctions.

The report shall present evidence about whether any current or former government official of Saudi Arabia had advanced knowledge of the killing, ordered the killing, or was involved in tampering with related evidence.

It shall also list foreign persons that the ODNI has high confidence were responsible for Khashoggi's death, materially assisted in causing the death, or impeded any investigations into the death. The Department of State and the Department of Homeland Security shall bar such foreign persons from entering the United States and revoke visas belonging to such persons.

The State Department shall report to Congress about the extent to which Saudi Arabia is responsible for gross violations of internationally recognized human rights and about U.S. actions to address such violations. The report shall also describe the publication by Saudi Arabia's Ministry of Education of intolerant educational materials and U.S. actions to encourage an end to the production and use of such materials.